ST JUST AND ST MAWES HERITAGE GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We collect store and exhibit items which record the history of the parish of St Just in Roseland in Cornwall. We put on exhibitions, talks and films. We work with all age groups and have joined with other organisations to carry out projects. We now own 2 B.T. telephone boxes in which we display information and photos describing the history of the parish.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Cornwall
Governance
- 12 September 2014: CIO registration
- 25 November 2020: Funds received from 1065453 THE CHARLES FREDERICK ANDREWS TRUST
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHRIS WILLIAMS | Chair | 25 June 2014 |
|
|
||||||
Iain Speirs | Trustee | 04 August 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Andrew D Fordham | Trustee | 05 February 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Bob Morse | Trustee | 20 November 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Clive Burge | Trustee | 05 September 2019 |
|
|
||||||
John Roberts | Trustee | 05 September 2017 |
|
|
||||||
JENNY JOHNSON | Trustee | 25 June 2014 |
|
|
||||||
JULIAN RONALD RALPH GERMAN | Trustee | 25 June 2014 |
|
|||||||
PETER TEAGUE | Trustee | 25 June 2014 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2019 | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.72k | £2.46k | £2.28k | £2.57k | £3.46k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.53k | £17.70k | £37.71k | £2.28k | £2.86k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 04 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | 04 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 15 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | 15 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 30 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | 30 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 27 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | 27 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 15 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | 15 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 12 Sep 2014
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN THE HISTORY OF THE PARISH OF ST JUST IN ROSELAND, CORNWALL IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE FOLLOWING MEANS: 1. PROVIDING A FACILITY FOR THE COLLECTION AND DISPLAY OF PHOTOGRAPHS AND ARTEFACTS WHICH RECORD THE HISTORY OF THE PARISH 2. PUBLIC EXHIBITIONS, TALKS AND WORKSHOPS ABOUT THE HISTORY OF THE PARISH
Contact information
- Address:
-
AR DOWR
TRELAWNEY ROAD
ST. MAWES
TRURO
TR2 5BU
- Phone:
- 01326270379
- Email:
- ardowr@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window