Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF HACKNEY

Charity number: 1158545
Charity reporting is up to date (181 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £2.71m £2.77m £1.95m £1.98m £2.64m
Total expenditure £4.17m £3.51m £2.23m £2.57m £2.77m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Donations and legacies £1.04m £1.50m £1.37m £979.02k £1.61m
Income - Other trading activities £108.38k £188.77k £513.16k £467.82k £954.92k
Income - Charitable activities £3.38k £393 £24.66k £524.04k £73.40k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £23.78k £11.74k £1.22k £2.56k £3.04k
Income - Other £1.54m £1.07m £49.45k £4.10k £3.42k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £844.04k £1.37m £1.85m £1.99m £1.84m
Expenditure - Raising funds £6.90k £9.71k £454 £446.35k £0
Expenditure - Governance £9.50k £12.95k £12.84k £0 £15.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £3.32m £2.13m £382.87k £130.85k £936.66k