PRINCE OF WALES ALUMNI ASSOCIATION UK & IRELAND

Charity number: 1158526
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The principal activities of POWAA-UK are the provision of educational support to the pupils and staff of the Prince of Wales school; working collaboratively as a member of the global partnership of POW alumni associations to improve educational outcomes of the pupils of the school.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023

Total income: £48,117
Total expenditure: £34,716

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Other Finance
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales
  • Sierra Leone

Governance

Registration history:
  • 11 September 2014: CIO registration
  • 23 February 2016: Funds received from 803771 THE OLD PRINCEWALEANS (UNITED KINGDOM AND IRELAND ...
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:
  • THE OLD PRINCEWALEANS ASSOCIATION (UK & IRELAND BRANCH) (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

19 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
NORMAN THOMPSON Chair 20 October 2019
None on record
IBRAHIM JALLOH Trustee 17 October 2021
None on record
REGINALD MASSAQUOI Trustee 17 October 2021
None on record
Nathaniel Emile Akabi-Davis Trustee 17 October 2021
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARK, BROMLEY
Received: On time
SIERRA LEONE ASSOCIATION OF TRINITONIANS UK
Received: 9 days late
Dr Mohamed Sorie Ibrahim Kamara Trustee 18 October 2020
None on record
Dr ALEX FESTUS JONATHAN BLANSHARD Trustee 18 October 2020
None on record
Dr Lucien Raymond Turay Trustee 18 October 2020
None on record
Donald Hudson Cecil Asgill Trustee 18 October 2020
None on record
Davidson Sawyerr Trustee 18 October 2020
None on record
EDMOND ROGERS BASCHO-GEORGE Trustee 20 October 2019
None on record
REMMIE AKIBO-BETTS Trustee 21 October 2018
SIERRA LEONE ASSOCIATION OF TRINITONIANS UK
Received: 9 days late
DILYS BENJAMIN Trustee 21 October 2018
None on record
Dr HAZELL SHOKELLU THOMPSON Trustee 21 October 2018
None on record
ESTHER NANCY BOLAJI Trustee 21 October 2018
None on record
EUGENE GERARD DENNIS BENJAMIN Trustee 18 October 2015
None on record
MR Wilfred Isaac Charles Macfoy Trustee 18 October 2015
None on record
PATRICK DIXON Trustee 18 October 2015
None on record
Rev Ian Luke-Macauley Trustee 18 October 2015
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PETERS & ST PAUL BATTERSEA
Received: On time
Dr KAYODE ROBBIN-COKER Trustee 18 October 2015
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023
Total gross income £33.66k £25.15k £24.32k £28.82k £48.12k
Total expenditure £31.26k £29.32k £14.51k £33.13k £34.72k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2023 01 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 01 July 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2022 24 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 24 July 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2021 25 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 25 April 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2020 15 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 15 February 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2019 19 February 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 19 February 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
10 ST. SWITHINS COTTAGES
HOWE GREEN
CHELMSFORD
CM2 7TN
Phone:
01245476808