Financial history MANCHESTER MESIVTA JEWISH GRAMMAR SCHOOL

Charity Number: 1158815
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £886.56k £952.96k £985.61k £1.17m £791.62k
Total expenditure £795.01k £943.19k £1.05m £1.22m £840.24k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £36.02k
Income - Donations and legacies £397.72k £424.14k £430.99k £140.78k £157.17k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £949.85k £585.35k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £35 £8 £3 £25 £60
Income - Other £488.80k £528.81k £554.62k £80.25k £49.05k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £783.22k £928.30k £1.04m £1.21m £823.40k
Expenditure - Raising funds £11.80k £14.89k £11.88k £9.96k £16.83k
Expenditure - Governance £1.50k £2.33k £1.65k £7.68k £2.10k
Expenditure - Grants institution £288.75k £353.59k £352.71k £446.57k £120.80k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0