COMMONWEALTH PHARMACISTS ASSOCIATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The CPA advances health, promotes wellbeing and improves education for the benefit of the public. We support the development of safe and effective systems of medicines management, healthier lifestyles, and the reduction of health inequalities. We achieve this through supporting our member organisations to improve the use of medicines through access to education and collaborative networks.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2018
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 15 December 2015: Standard registration
- 12 July 2019: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 12 July 2019: Funds transferred to 1176132 THE COMMONWEALTH PHARMACISTS ASSOCIATION
- CPA (Working name)
- Paying staff
- Risk management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2016 | 30/06/2017 | 30/06/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £49.78k | £54.62k | £66.01k | |
|
Total expenditure | £51.26k | £73.76k | £87.61k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2018 | 30 April 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2018 | 30 April 2019 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 June 2017 | 30 April 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2017 | 30 April 2018 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 June 2016 | 27 April 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2016 | 27 April 2017 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01/01/1970 AS AMENDED ON 01/01/2007 AS AMENDED ON 12/01/2015 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 22/10/2015
Charitable objects
3.1 TO ADVANCE HEALTH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY COLLABORATING WITH OTHER HEALTH-RELATED ORGANISATIONS AND INSTITUTIONS WITHIN AND OUTSIDE THE COMMONWEALTH AND PROVIDING ADMINISTRATIVE AND FINANCIAL SUPPORT WHERE POSSIBLE; 3.2 TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT (AND PARTICULARLY AMONGST PHARMACEUTICAL STAFF) BY FACILITATING THE DISSEMINATION OF KNOWLEDGE ABOUT THE PHARMACEUTICAL SCIENCES AND THE PROFESSIONAL PRACTICE OF PHARMACY THROUGH MEETINGS, LITERATURE DISTRIBUTION, ELECTRONIC MEDIA AND FELLOWSHIP OR EXCHANGE PROGRAMMES; 3.3 TO ADVANCE HEALTH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THROUGH QUALITY IMPROVEMENT OF PHARMACY PRACTICE, PARTICULARLY IN RELATION TO THE PROMOTION OF SAFE AND EFFECTIVE SYSTEMS OF MEDICINES MANAGEMENT, THE PROMOTION OF HEALTHIER LIFESTYLES AND SUPPORTING MEASURES TO REDUCE HEALTH INEQUALITIES.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window