THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF SITTINGBOURNE HOLY TRINITY WITH BOBBING

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
This is a church that conduct Sunday services, run various activities in the week to support the community- through Small Groups, Lunch clubs, Railway club, Children activities , Conduct Weddings, Funerals and Baptisms.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £900 from 1 government grant(s)
People

22 Trustee(s)
80 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Kent
Governance
- 28 October 2014: Previously excepted registration
- HOLY TRINITY WITH BOBBING (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
22 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Elaine Appleton | Trustee | 13 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Martyn Kitney | Trustee | 13 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christina Susan Wem | Trustee | 13 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Darren Appleton | Trustee | 13 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Jackson | Trustee | 20 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jane Marchbank | Trustee | 20 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Ann Mackenzie | Trustee | 20 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Linda Chappell | Trustee | 20 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jane Bourne | Trustee | 20 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev David Ridley | Trustee | 20 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Price | Trustee | 11 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
CLAIRE TUCKER | Trustee | 11 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Terence Fagg | Trustee | 17 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Philip Cross | Trustee | 17 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Trevor Phillips | Trustee | 28 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Foreman | Trustee | 28 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
PETER LE BEAU MBE, JP | Trustee | 08 May 2017 |
|
|||||
BOB GROOMBRIDGE | Trustee | 08 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
BUKI ODENIRAN | Trustee | 08 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
SUE SAMSON | Trustee | 08 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
MIKE LUSTED | Trustee | 08 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
JAN PHILLIPS | Trustee | 31 March 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £165.09k | £180.46k | £204.03k | £195.53k | £430.44k | |
|
Total expenditure | £164.54k | £165.83k | £188.63k | £195.41k | £207.39k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £900 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 03 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 03 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 08 November 2023 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 08 November 2023 | 8 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 08 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 08 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 08 November 2021 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 30 December 2021 | 60 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 09 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 25 November 2020 | 25 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES THAT CAME INTO FORCE ON 01 APR 2012
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
HOLY TRINITY & BOBBING
CHURCH STREET
SITTINGBOURNE
KENT
ME10 3EG
- Phone:
- 01795227130
- Email:
- office@htsb.church
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window