Financial history MISSIONASSIST

Charity number: 1162807
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/11/2020 30/11/2021 30/11/2022 30/11/2023 30/11/2024
Total gross income £37.84k £26.11k £36.55k £49.07k £65.59k
Total expenditure £31.11k £22.52k £36.55k £39.17k £46.68k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A