High Peak Partnership

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of Minister and staff to serve the needs of the circuit. Ensured services of worship occurred across the five churches of the circuit. Ensured that Local Preachers had the opportunity for regular development. Sought to ensure the highest standards of Safeguarding were met within the churches and circuit. Developed Messy Church in three churches and an informal monthly service.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

37 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Cheshire East
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 18 November 2014: Previously excepted registration
- HIGH PEAK CIRCUIT (Working name)
- HIGH PEAK METHODIST CIRCUIT (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
37 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Margaret Ruth Hayter | Trustee | 17 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sandy Winifred Picot | Trustee | 14 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jeanette Saxby | Trustee | 06 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Tim Saxby | Trustee | 06 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Crook | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nicole Parry | Trustee | 10 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
John Morten | Trustee | 07 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Angela Timothy | Trustee | 07 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alan Woolley | Trustee | 05 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Picot | Trustee | 20 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Charles Winterbottom | Trustee | 30 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Philip Botham | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
JEAN MARY GREENHALGH | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rev Andrew Neil Parker | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ronald Spence Sinclair | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|||||
PETER DAVID JOHNSON | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|||||
Hazel Thompson | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
JOHN ANFIELD | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Wheeldon | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Donna Hodgson | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Glyn Aneurin Rowlands | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ian Malcolm Geoffrey Stubbs | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Samuel Smith | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
MR KEN GIBSON | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
PHILIP ANDREW DEACON | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Albert Warrington | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sheila Booth | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
DIANE FARROW | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rev David Arthur Harrison | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Anne Gibson | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
PETER SIDNEY HELPS | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
ANNE MAYO | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
JULIE ANNE MURDY | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Richard Silson | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
MR MICHAEL DOUGHTY | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Brioni Evans | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
CLAIRE CROOK Dr | Trustee | 01 September 1999 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £125.28k | £160.76k | £537.25k | £147.68k | £176.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £111.96k | £216.74k | £443.12k | £346.83k | £224.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | £1.06k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | £536.20k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £443.12k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | £120.99k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 19 September 2024 | 81 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 19 September 2024 | 81 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 07 November 2023 | 130 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 07 November 2023 | 130 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 29 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 29 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 30 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 30 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 25 February 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 25 February 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF UNION (1932) AND METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976) ADOPTED 01 SEP 2003 as amended on 01 Sep 2019
Charitable objects
THE PURPOSES OF THE METHODIST CHURCH ARE AND SHALL BE DEEMED TO HAVE BEEN SINCE THE DATE OF UNION THE ADVANCEMENT OF - (A) THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINAL STANDARDS AND THE DISCIPLINE OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; (B) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CONNEXIONAL, DISTRICT, CIRCUIT, LOCAL OR OTHER ORGANISATION OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; (C) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY SOCIETY OR INSTITUTION SUBSIDUARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH; (D) ANY PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CHARITY BEING A CHARITY SUBSIDIARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The High Peak Partnership Office
Buxton Methodist Church
Chapel Street
Buxton
Derbyshire
SK17 6HX
- Phone:
- 07912144002
- Email:
- highpeakmethodist@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window