Trustees GUY'S AND ST THOMAS' FOUNDATION
Charity Number: 1160316

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Susanne Johanne Given | Chair | 21 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Julia Charlotte Palca | Trustee | 20 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Patricia Thomas | Trustee | 10 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Lee | Trustee | 12 October 2023 |
|
|||||
David Bennett | Trustee | 12 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Nikita Kanani | Trustee | 04 February 2021 |
|
|||||
Dr Dhananjayan Sriskandarajah | Trustee | 08 April 2020 |
|
|||||
Katherine Natasha Ward | Trustee | 17 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Yasemin Saltuk Lamy | Trustee | 01 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
HELEN RUTH BAILEY | Trustee | 14 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
SIR RONALD JAMES KERR | Trustee | 07 December 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.