THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. SEPULCHRE WITHOUT NEWGATE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
St Sepulchre's is part of the Church of England. We promote the Christian religion, with a particular focus on the workplace and music, as the National Musicians' Church. We provide regular Christian worship services, open to all; and the teaching of Christianity through sermons, courses and small groups. We also provide a venue for the staging of concerts and other events, such as lecture series.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Camden
- City Of London
- City Of Westminster
- Islington
- Kensington And Chelsea
Governance
- 07 January 2015: Previously excepted registration
- ST SEPULCHRE'S PCC (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Nicholas John Leigh Mottershead | Chair | 28 February 2021 |
|
|||||
Philippa Jane Meryl Dutton | Trustee | 31 May 2022 |
|
|||||
RUTH ALEXANDRA BAXTER | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £338.14k | £243.04k | £205.19k | £252.46k | £322.77k | |
|
Total expenditure | £318.19k | £274.48k | £212.70k | £265.42k | £335.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £7.34k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 20 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 20 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 20 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 20 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 28 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 30 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 21 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 21 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES THAT CAME INTO FORCE ON 02 JAN 1957
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Sepulchre Without Newgate Churc
Holborn Viaduct
LONDON
EC1A 2DQ
- Phone:
- 02072361145
- Email:
- office@hsl.church
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window