Financial history RADCLIFFE-ON-TRENT METHODIST CHURCH

Charity number: 1159370
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £310.65k £92.67k £84.06k £92.41k £98.05k
Total expenditure £541.67k £118.12k £86.52k £88.24k £82.99k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £500 N/A