Financial history THE JAGCLIF CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1163459
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £34.51m £25.15m £21.37m £16.14m £22.78m
Total expenditure £7.41m £10.89m £16.17m £9.58m £11.47m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £13.90m £25.04m £21.00m £15.63m £21.98m
Income - Other trading activities £67.67k £109.84k £345.67k £436.46k £572.74k
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £18.64k £587 £805 £69.76k £221.27k
Income - Other £20.52m £0 £20.15k £13.61k £1.90k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £5.56m £3.81m £6.83m £449.05k £1.75m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £12.70k £12.55k £13.09k £51.89k £34.85k
Expenditure - Grants institution £3.43m £1.75m £6.38m £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £1.85m £7.09m £9.34m £9.13m £9.72m