Trustees THE HERITAGE CRAFTS ASSOCIATION
Charity Number: 1159208

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael Osbaldeston | Trustee | 01 May 2025 |
|
|||||
Emma Louise Jhita | Trustee | 01 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Simon Eli Sadinsky-Heisler | Trustee | 01 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Duncan-Finn | Trustee | 01 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Daahir Ahmed Mohamed | Trustee | 01 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Jan Lillie | Trustee | 01 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Robert Murray | Trustee | 07 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jo Sealy | Trustee | 27 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alison Robinson Canham | Trustee | 01 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Daniel Reid | Trustee | 30 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
David Cowling Clarke | Trustee | 30 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Chen | Trustee | 30 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
MS KATY BEVAN | Trustee | 22 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Laura Grace Southall | Trustee | 22 June 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.