Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF WICKHAM BISHOPS & LITTLE BRAXTED

Charity number: 1159874
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £74.98k £125.41k £124.23k £102.37k £126.32k
Total expenditure £124.24k £89.17k £89.17k £97.49k £180.81k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A