THEATRE ROYAL HAYMARKET MASTERCLASS TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE TRUST PROVIDES ACCESS TO ALL ASPECTS OF THEATRE, FREE OF CHARGE, TARGETING 16-30 YEAR OLDS FROM ALL BACKGROUNDS THROUGH A REGULAR PROGRAMME OF EVENTS AND SPECIAL PROJECTS, WORKSHOPS, APPRENTICESHIPS, CAREERS ADVICE, CREATIVE AND NETWORKING OPPORTUNITES. THE ACTIVITIES OF THE TRUST WERE TRANSFERRED OVER FROM THE THEATRE ROYAL HAYMARKET MASTERCLASS TRUST, REGISTERED CHARITY NUMBER 1070117
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £5,046 from 1 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 07 January 2015: Standard registration
- 18 February 2016: Funds received from 1070117 THEATRE ROYAL HAYMARKET MASTERCLASS TRUST
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jeremy Arthur Parr | Chair | 25 November 2019 |
|
|||||
Mei Hsin Rolfe | Trustee | 25 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Adam Foster | Trustee | 20 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Maurice Moussy Salem | Trustee | 25 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Ryerson Douglas Church | Trustee | 02 October 2019 |
|
|||||
ARNOLD MICHAEL CROOK | Trustee | 08 April 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £262.73k | £141.06k | £208.49k | £148.83k | £174.14k | |
|
Total expenditure | £173.73k | £148.51k | £185.95k | £184.57k | £183.63k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £7.08k | £5.13k | N/A | £5.05k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 05 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 05 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 05 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 05 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 12 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 12 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 18 DEC 2014
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC OF THE EDUCATION OF YOUNG PERSONS BY THE PROMOTION OF THE STUDY OF DRAMA AND IN PARTICULAR THE ART AND CRAFT OF THEATRE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Theatre Royal Haymarket Masterclass Trust
Theatre Royal Haymarket
18 Suffolk Street
LONDON
SW1Y 4HT
- Phone:
- 02073899660
- Email:
- clare@masterclass.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window