THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF WEST HAM

Charity Number: 1159466
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

All Saints West Ham is an Anglican Church providing Public Worship Services on a weekly basis, Worship Space, Pastoral Care and charitable events open to all, as an expression of the Christian faith.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £242,149
Total expenditure: £246,142

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Newham

Governance

Registration history:
  • 03 December 2014: Previously excepted registration
Organisation type:
Previously excepted
Other names:
  • WEST HAM PARISH CHURCH OF ALL SAINTS (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

20 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jacqueline Driver Trustee 25 May 2023
THE LONDON DIOCESAN FUND
Received: On time
THE LONDON DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST LEONARD SHOREDITCH
Received: On time
HACKNEY LIGHTHOUSE CIO
Received: On time
Katherine Johal Trustee 25 May 2023
None on record
Andrew Alleyne Trustee 25 May 2023
None on record
Rachel Richard Trustee 25 May 2023
None on record
Ucindami Mafeni Trustee 25 May 2023
None on record
Matilda Amankwa-Dei Mrs Trustee 25 May 2023
None on record
Robin Talbot Trustee 01 September 2022
None on record
Dr Deborah Helena Benros Trustee 09 May 2022
None on record
RACHEL EMILY WATTS Trustee 09 May 2022
None on record
BENJAMIN TITUS JAMES COOMBS Trustee 09 May 2022
None on record
John Adeno Trustee 09 May 2022
None on record
BEATRICE ZARA KWANOKI ADDO Trustee 09 May 2022
None on record
Temi Obembe Trustee 09 May 2022
None on record
SAMUEL CROSS Trustee 09 May 2022
None on record
Rev Simon Nicholls Trustee 01 May 2021
None on record
Rev AL GORDON Trustee 01 January 2021
ALPHA INTERNATIONAL
Received: On time
HACKNEY PARISH ALMSHOUSES CHARITY
Received: On time
JULIUS OLAKUNLE FAMUYIWA Trustee 28 April 2019
None on record
SARAH RAINE Vice Chair Trustee 22 April 2018
None on record
PATIENCE OHURUOGU Trustee 02 April 2017
None on record
Susan Elfreda Cave Trustee 01 January 2016
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £90.89k £68.66k £78.03k £224.51k £242.15k
Total expenditure £92.30k £68.67k £85.48k £222.22k £246.14k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 30 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 30 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 31 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 31 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 31 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 31 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 22 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 25 June 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 19 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 20 August 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
All Saints Westham Parish Church
Church Street
LONDON
E15 3HU
Phone:
02085190764
Email:
No information available