URCHFONT VILLAGE CRICKET CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing facilities for all age groups to play and be coached at cricket. We also host Urchfont Croquet Club
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 08 January 2015: CIO registration
- UCC (Working name)
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mr Allen David Mottram | Chair | 01 January 2012 |
|
|||||
Andrew Gregory Cummine | Trustee | 07 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Leslie Pillet-Smith | Trustee | 27 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael Read | Trustee | 09 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Timothy Fox | Trustee | 09 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alexander James Elizabeth Hiscock | Trustee | 09 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Colonel Brendan Shaw | Trustee | 09 April 2021 |
|
|||||
JOHN SEAVERS | Trustee | 01 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
ALAN CROUCH | Trustee | 01 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
PAUL GREENSTREET | Trustee | 01 January 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.43k | £7.27k | £16.36k | £18.59k | £16.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £26.42k | £3.99k | £14.39k | £23.22k | £15.94k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £750 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £5.00k | N/A | N/A | £750 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 05 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 05 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 07 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 07 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 18 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 18 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 28 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 02 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 02 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 08 Jan 2015
Charitable objects
PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION, IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE PLAYING OF CRICKET FOR THE BENEFIT OF PEOPLE LIVING IN URCHFONT AND SURROUNDING AREAS.
Area of benefit
IN URCHFONT AND SURROUNDING AREAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Cranfield
The Bottom
Urchfont
Devizes
SN10 4SD
- Phone:
- 01380840612
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window