SUTTON-CUM-DUCKMANTON EDUCATION FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We offer grants to residents of the Sutton-cum-Duckmanton area who are undertaking further education.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 28 September 1976: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jack Woolley | Trustee | 15 February 2022 |
|
|||||
Paul Goodwin | Trustee | 14 October 2020 |
|
|||||
Joy Phillips | Trustee | 14 October 2020 |
|
|||||
Brian Robert Brocksopp | Trustee | 07 October 2014 |
|
|||||
Janet Bradshaw Mrs | Trustee | 15 September 2011 |
|
|||||
ANN CLARK | Trustee | 15 September 2011 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.72k | £7.10k | £1.55m | £2.46m | £38.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.51k | £1.69k | £7.12k | £11.25k | £8.79k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | £5 | £5 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | £438 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | £3.06k | £3.54k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | £1.55m | £2.45m | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £2.30k | £11.25k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | £354 | £3.85k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | £4.81k | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 09 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 09 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 17 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 02 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 8 JUNE 1981 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION ON 29 SEPTEMBER 1999 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 19 SEP 2017 as amended on 12 Oct 2021
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF PERSONS BETWEEN THE AGE OF 18 AND 25 YEARS WHO ARE RESIDENT, OR WHO HAVE A PARENT OR PARENTS RESIDENT IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF SUTTON-CUM-DUCKMANTON AND WHO IN THE OPINION OF THE TRUSTEES ARE IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE RESOLUTION AND 1981 SCHEME).
Area of benefit
ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF SUTTON-CUM-DUCKMANTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Arkwright Centre
Hardwick Drive
Arkwright Town
Chesterfield
S44 5BS
- Phone:
- 01246229203
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window