HOPE HOUSE HAITI (UK)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charitable objectives of the charity are to relieve financial hardship, sickness and to advance the education of children and young people living in Haiti in particular, but not exclusively by the provision of funds and services to Hope House Tree of Life Ministries (known as Hope House and Hope House Christian Academy).
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Haiti
Governance
- 13 March 2015: Standard registration
- HHH(UK) (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Brenda Rossiter Mrs | Trustee | 03 December 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
Jonathan Paul Masters | Trustee | 14 April 2020 |
|
|
||||||||
Rev William Kemp | Trustee | 25 November 2019 |
|
|||||||||
Yvonne Fulcher | Trustee | 03 July 2018 |
|
|
||||||||
Jean Whiting | Trustee | 12 December 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £85.15k | £64.52k | £75.78k | £75.05k | £99.82k | |
|
Total expenditure | £82.41k | £64.20k | £79.11k | £73.65k | £72.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 19 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 19 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 19 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 19 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 14 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 14 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 10 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 10 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 27 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 27 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15 APR 2013 AS AMENDED ON 09/03/2015
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, SICKNESS AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE LIVING IN HAITI, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF FUNDS AND SERVICES TO HOPE TREE OF LIFE MINISTRIES (TO BE KNOWN AS HOPE HOUSE AND HOPE HOUSE CHRISTIAN ACADEMY).
Contact information
- Address:
-
Downham
Brighton Road
Hurstpierpoint
HASSOCKS
West Sussex
BN6 9EF
- Phone:
- 07789 380207
- Email:
- info@hopehousehaiti.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window