KESHET DIVERSITY UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
KeshetUK exists so that no one should be forced to choose between their LGBT plus and Jewish identity. We engage with schools, youth and young adult organisations, synagogues, and community organisations to ensure that Jewish LGBT plus people and their families are included throughout Jewish life in the UK.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 03 September 2015: Standard registration
- KESHET UK (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Matthew Lewis | Trustee | 18 June 2024 |
|
|||||
Dr Joanna Ziff | Trustee | 05 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ella Rose | Trustee | 07 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stephanie Saffer | Trustee | 07 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Robin Moss | Trustee | 19 July 2021 |
|
|||||
Simon Jacob Solomon | Trustee | 14 June 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £107.20k | £122.27k | £113.69k | £144.55k | £183.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £91.45k | £100.25k | £114.80k | £169.01k | £187.61k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £11.71k | £485 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 06 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 06 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 15 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 15 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 20 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 20 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 26 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 26 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 23 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 23 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 14/05/2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 11/08/2015
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY, ADVANCE EDUCATION AND ELIMINATE DISCRIMINATION IN RELATION TO LESBIAN, GAY, BISEXUAL AND TRANSGENDER (LGBT) PEOPLE IN PARTICULAR LGBT JEWS WITHIN THE JEWISH AND WIDER COMMUNITY BY SUCH MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Suite 86
176 Finchley Road
LONDON
NW3 6BT
- Phone:
- 020 7443 5133
- Email:
- info@keshetuk.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window