TURN END TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Conserve, protect and maintain the Turn End estate; help the advancement of education and scholarship in the art of building and garden design; promote public knowledge and understanding of architecture, planning, landscape architecture and other creative arts.(Turn End estate comprises 3 EH Grade 2* listed 1960s houses, other buildings and the large Turn End garden.)
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Buckinghamshire
Governance
- 09 June 2015: CIO registration
- 11 May 2018: Funds received from 1072771 TURN END CHARITABLE TRUST
No other names
- Conflicting interests
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Laura London | Trustee | 14 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Neil Beagrie | Trustee | 02 September 2023 |
|
|||||
Lynda Farmer | Trustee | 29 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sophie Stone | Trustee | 27 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Peter John Aldington | Trustee | 18 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET ANNE ALDINGTON | Trustee | 30 May 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.98k | £3.48k | £30.45k | £35.07k | £43.86k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.34k | £8.92k | £15.97k | £27.70k | £42.84k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 21 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 21 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 23 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 23 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 09 Jun 2015
Charitable objects
(1) THE SYMPATHETIC CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND MAINTENANCE OF THE CHARITY ASSETS AS EVOLVING OR LIVING ENTITIES AS DESIGNED, ALTERED OR LAID OUT BY PETER JOHN ALDINGTON AND TO MAKE THEM AVAILABLE FOR THE USE AND THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC. (2) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND SCHOLARSHIP IN THE ART OF BUILDING AND GARDEN DESIGN AND IN SO DOING SEEK TO FOSTER THE INTEGRATION OF THESE TWO DISCIPLINES INTO A SINGLE INDIVISIBLE PROCESS EACH ELEMENT TO INTERACT WITH AND BE DEPENDENT ON THE OTHER. (3) THE PROMOTION OF PUBLIC KNOWLEDGE AND UNDERSTANDING OF ARCHITECTURE, PLANNING, LANDSCAPE ARCHITECTURE AND OTHER CREATIVE ARTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 Kindleton
Great Linford
MILTON KEYNES
MK14 5EA
- Phone:
- 07796870855
- Email:
- turnendtrustevents@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window