ST COLUMBA'S OXFORD UNITED REFORMED CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity operates through its local church, providing regular public worship for all; it promotes the Christian religion, and teaches the faith to all ages. It serves the whole community by hiring out premises and providing resources for a wide range of community groups and activities. It particularly ministers to a charity serving the needs of lonely people and amongst the LGBT community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 09 June 2015: Previously excepted registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alia Elisabeth Shore Eyres | Trustee | 09 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andrew George Philip Smith | Trustee | 17 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr KIRSTEN RENEE JOHNSON B.MUS. | Trustee | 25 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
JONATHAN JAMES WILLIAM HERRING | Trustee | 22 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dr GORDON ALEXANDER WOODS | Trustee | 22 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
MARION ROSEMARY KNAGG | Trustee | 22 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dr ADRIAN WILLIAM MOORE | Trustee | 22 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dr JILL WINIFRED FRESEN PH.D | Trustee | 22 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
DAVID THOMAS NORTH | Trustee | 22 January 2015 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £112.27k | £79.79k | £119.61k | £136.46k | £162.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £94.06k | £107.99k | £74.15k | £136.37k | £161.88k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 14 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 14 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 24 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 05 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 05 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 19 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 19 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 20 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUSTS DISTILLED FROM THE UNITED REFORMED CHURCH ACTS (1972 AND 1981) AND SCHEME OF UNION (1972) ADOPTED 23 FEB 2014
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY IS THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE SCHEME OF UNION OF THE UNITED REFORMED CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Columbas Church
Alfred Street
OXFORD
OX1 4EH
- Phone:
- 01865274953
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window