Financial history CRED FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 1160967
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £49.78k £217.72k £117.42k £83.66k £135.56k
Total expenditure £47.18k £174.66k £109.43k £90.51k £191.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A