Financial history 7029 CLUN CASTLE LIMITED

Charity Number: 505793
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £1.12k £637 £55.58k £446 £6.09k
Total expenditure £548.45k £415.53k £537.27k £106.87k £549.36k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A