Trustees STAMFORD METHODIST CIRCUIT
Charity number: 1160930

Charity reporting is up to date (32 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
34 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Charlotte Davis | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|||||
Audrey Hensman | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|||||
Elizabeth Clare Hodgson | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|||||
Stephen Matthew Fallow | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|||||
Barry Charles Streets | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|||||
Olive Ruzvidzo | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nina Jane Rawlins | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Janet Elizabeth Hetherington | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Iain James Cameron | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ellen Whiffen | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Anthony David Law | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Francis Batstone | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev Rebecca Helen Wright | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Frances Coles | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Vivienne Jean Higgins | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Edward Leslie Wilks | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Georgina Finn | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nadine Denise Mackie | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Atwell King | Trustee | 06 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Andrew James Lester Hollins | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|||||
John Victor Bassill | Trustee | 09 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Peter David Wright BSc | Trustee | 29 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Philip Delwyn Vaughan Jones | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER JAMES PURSEHOUSE | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Graham Stapleton | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Roger Anthony Macey | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET LOUISE STONES BA DIPED | Trustee | 15 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
EILEEN RAY | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
IAN RAY | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
MR GEOFF HEATHCOTE | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
JEAN SUFF | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
DR CHRIS SWORN | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|||||
MOYRA CARRINGTON COLLINS | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH ANN HEATHCOTE | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.