Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST LUKE EDGBASTON BIRMINGHAM

Charity Number: 1161342
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £1.03m £1.28m £2.06m £1.93m £2.44m
Total expenditure £1.04m £1.25m £1.77m £2.13m £2.31m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £26.20k £15.86k £800 £13.60k £16.00k
Income - Donations and legacies £810.22k £949.86k £1.51m £1.19m £1.55m
Income - Other trading activities £16.77k £36.17k £93.23k £80.74k £143.05k
Income - Charitable activities £20.05k £43.13k £115.33k £261.72k £305.11k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £11.06k £10.83k £13.02k £7.00k £7.07k
Income - Other £169.71k £237.67k £335.69k £395.02k £437.45k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.03m £1.25m £1.77m £2.13m £2.31m
Expenditure - Raising funds £3.30k £0 £0 £0 £3.28k
Expenditure - Governance £9.99k £7.20k £0 £9.73k £10.69k
Expenditure - Grants institution £14.00k £52.20k £0 £0 £162.75k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0