Accounts and annual returns ELY SINFONIA

Charity number: 1161642
Charity reporting is up to date (72 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 10 September 2024 72 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 28 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 13 July 2022 13 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 20 July 2021 20 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 12 November 2020 135 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 12 November 2020 135 days late Download Open in new window