Financial history ELY SINFONIA

Charity number: 1161642
Charity reporting is up to date (72 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £31.33k £13.57k £1.21k £12.70k £21.88k
Total expenditure £24.72k £12.44k £6.65k £17.17k £21.14k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A