Trustees ELY SINFONIA
Charity number: 1161642

Charity reporting is up to date (72 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROZ CHALMERS | Chair | 11 October 2015 |
|
|||||
Alexander Jameson | Trustee | 01 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Carol May McEvoy | Trustee | 01 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Elizabeth Ewins | Trustee | 01 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Pritchard | Trustee | 01 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Richard John Williamson | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Robert Millman | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Sewell | Trustee | 05 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
JOHN CHALMERS | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
CHARLOTTE ANNE DEAN MA | Trustee | 11 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
KATY BAKER | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.