THE PYE HISTORY TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Research and document the history of the Pye group of companies. Provide historical & technical information & material for exhibitions & displays of scientific, electronic and other engineering products and artifacts designed and manufactured by the Pye group of companies and allied organisations, to registered museums in the Cambridge area, for the purpose of educating the general public.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
- The General Public/mankind
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 19 June 2015: CIO registration
- PHT (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PAULINE JOAN HOWES DIP.M MCIM | Trustee | 29 October 2019 |
|
|||||
David Noel Featherby | Trustee | 29 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
ROGER DENIS CRABTREE | Trustee | 29 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Michael Peter Wassall | Trustee | 19 September 2018 |
|
|||||
Simon Richard Howes | Trustee | 11 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
BOB BATES | Trustee | 19 March 2015 |
|
|||||
DICK MCMULLAN | Trustee | 19 March 2015 |
|
|||||
Richard John Howes MSc MCIM | Trustee | 19 March 2015 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.17k | £3.05k | £5.31k | £6.10k | £5.09k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.50k | £4.13k | £1.76k | £5.00k | £2.12k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 17 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 17 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 16 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 16 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 19 Jun 2015
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE (I) THE ADVANCEMENT OF CULTURE, HERITAGE AND SCIENCE IN THE FIELDS OF:- SCIENTIFIC AND ANALYTICAL INSTRUMENTS RADIO COMMUNICATIONS, RADIO NAVIGATION, RADAR AND BROADCASTING RADIO, TELEVISION, AUDIO AND DOMESTIC EQUIPMENT ELECTRONIC COM PONENTS, MANUFACTURING PROCESSES A ND SUPPORTING SERVICES AND RELATED TECHNOLOGIES AND THEIR APPLICATIONS BY MEANS OF THE RESEARCH, DOCUMENTATION, COLLECTION, CONSERVATION, RESTORATION, EXHIBITION AND DISPLAY FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC OF VARIOUS ITEMS OF ELECTRICAL, MECHANICAL AND ELECTRONIC EQUIPMENT TOGETHER WITH DOCUMENTS, IMAGES AND EPHEMERA FROM THE PYE GROUP OF COMPANIES, TOGETHER WITH RELATED ARTIFACTS FROM OTHER ORGANISATIONS, EMBRACING PAST, PRESENT AND FUTURE TECHNOLOGY INNOVATIONS, (II) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN THE FIELDS OF ACTIVITY LISTED IN PARA 3 (I) ABOVE BY THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A MUSEUM OR OTHER MUSEUM EXHIBITS/DISPLAYS AND/OR BY THE CO-OPERATION AND INVOLVEMENT WITH OTHER MUSEUMS TO ACHIEVE THE SAME OBJECTIVES. (III) THE PROMOTION OF THE EFFICIENCY OF THE ARMED FORCES OF THE CROWN, AND THE EFFICIENCY OF THE CIVIL AGENCIES OF THE CROWN, EG POLICE, FIRE AND RESCUE SERVICES, AMBULANCE SERVICES AND OTHER GOVERNMENT AGENCIES BY THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A MUSEUM, COLLECTION OR EXHIBITION/DISPLAY WHICH CONTAINS ARTEFACTS CONNECTED WITH RADIO COMMUNICATIONS, ELECTRONICS AND ELECTRO-MECHANICAL APPARATUS IN MILITARY CONFLICT AND CIVIL EMERGENCIES DESIGNED AND/OR MANUFACTURED BY THE PYE GROUP OF COMPANIES AND RELATED ORGA NISATIONS. NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CIO FOR THE PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH [SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND)ACT 2005] AND [SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN LRELAND) 2008].
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 BURGOYNES FARM CLOSE
IMPINGTON
CAMBRIDGE
CB24 9ZU
- Phone:
- 01223234563
- Email:
- reply1@pyemuseum.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window