MANOR CHURCH AND COMMUNITY PROJECT

Charity number: 1163809
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

a) Prevention of social exclusion: - Activities for children with parents - After school provision for children - Activities for young people - Contact isolated older people - Improving the environment - Providing support to local residents b) Provision of facilities for recreation and leisure time activities: - Organising community events - Developing a multi-purpose community facility

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £66,018
Total expenditure: £54,671

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Sheffield City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 02 October 2015: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:
  • MCCP (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Debora Karen Marschner Chair 23 September 2015
SHEFFIELD METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time
Susan Elizabeth Richards Trustee 18 September 2023
None on record
Deacon Annabel Terry Trustee 06 September 2022
None on record
Philippa Dand Trustee 07 December 2021
CHURCHES FOR YOUTH IN SHEFFIELD 17
Received: On time
Heather Irene Rotherham Trustee 06 June 2019
SHEFFIELD METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time
Derek William Newman Trustee 23 September 2015
CROFT HOUSE SETTLEMENT
Received: On time
Claire Fiona Curtice Dalpra Trustee 23 September 2015
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £28.77k £218.40k £20.10k £26.44k £66.02k
Total expenditure £31.71k £218.10k £13.19k £17.50k £54.67k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 30 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 30 May 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 08 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 08 March 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 24 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 24 March 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 18 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 18 March 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 11 May 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 11 May 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
St Aidans Church
2 Manor Lane
SHEFFIELD
S2 1UF
Phone:
07841727121
Email:
No information available