Accounts and annual returns OLIVER & LEARN

Charity Number: 1163391
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 199 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 199 days
Annual return 31 December 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 565 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 565 days
Annual return 31 December 2021 20 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 16 June 2021 47 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2019 01 April 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 Not Required