Financial history MANCHESTER HIGH SCHOOL FOR GIRLS

Charity number: 1164323
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £11.09m £11.65m £12.11m £12.77m £13.71m
Total expenditure £10.60m £10.96m £11.78m £13.26m £13.68m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £151.63k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £6.52k £10.36k £34.70k £60.89k £15.00k
Income - Other trading activities £67.57k £40.74k £96.48k £104.17k £111.43k
Income - Charitable activities £10.84m £11.45m £11.94m £12.51m £13.42m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £9.06k £7.82k £8.01k £70.44k £161.19k
Income - Other £168.25k £139.69k £27.31k £28.41k £7.62k
Income - Legacies £0 £10.00k £25.00k £17.77k £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £10.47m £10.82m £11.62m £13.10m £13.51m
Expenditure - Raising funds £66.79k £86.87k £93.74k £116.00k £126.25k
Expenditure - Governance £14.57k £14.22k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £174.13k £422.00k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £54.45k £57.04k £63.28k £36.43k £46.10k