THE GUIDE ASSOCIATION-COUNTY OF SEFTON

Charity number: 506468
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To pursue the objectives of Girlguiding UK concerned with assisting girls and young women to fulfil their potential by taking an active and responsible role in society.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024

Total income: £37,658
Total expenditure: £36,255

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
  • Lancashire
  • Sefton

Governance

Registration history:
  • 01 July 1977: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • Girlguiding County of Sefton (Working name)
  • SEFTON COUNTY OF THE GIRL GUIDES ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rose Bode Chair 11 January 2016
None on record
Wendy Graham Trustee 01 September 2023
None on record
Lynn Deacon Trustee 01 October 2022
None on record
Kirstie Gunby Trustee 08 September 2022
None on record
Susan McCormick Trustee 01 April 2022
None on record
Helen Fawcett Trustee 30 November 2020
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST ANDREW, MAGHULL, LIVERPOOL
Received: On time
MAGHULL PARISH INSTITUTE
Received: 14 days late
ANCIENT MAGHULL CHAPEL TRUST
Charity reporting is overdue by 464 days
Elizabeth Anne Sinker Trustee 04 November 2020
None on record
Nichola Joan James Trustee 04 November 2020
None on record
Karen Sutemire Trustee 01 August 2019
None on record
Helen Gillon Trustee 01 September 2018
None on record
Sarah Jane Bennett Trustee 01 January 2018
None on record
Chris WATKINSON Trustee
None on record
Andrew Malcolm Tate Trustee
LIVERPOOL ROAD METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
LEYLAND ROAD METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
SOUTHPORT METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: 68 days late

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £49.83k £58.01k £44.82k £45.56k £37.66k
Total expenditure £36.16k £44.98k £45.84k £48.10k £36.26k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 12 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024 12 February 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2023 25 March 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 25 March 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 25 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 25 March 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 03 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 03 May 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 03 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 03 May 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
7 Welwyn Avenue
Ainsdale
Southport
PR8 3BE
Phone:
01704573147
Email:
No information available