UNITED KINGDOM PRIMARY IMMUNODEFICIENCY NETWORK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The main objectives of UK PIN are the development of best practice guidance, maintenance of patient registry and advancement of education in primary immunodeficiency. The charity seeks to achieve its objectives by aiming to improve patient care through standardisation of care based on evidence and enhanced understanding of disease.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 18 November 2015: Standard registration
- UKPIN (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Fiona Culley | Chair | 20 December 2022 |
|
|||||
James Lowe | Trustee | 20 December 2022 |
|
|||||
Dr Doug Brown | Trustee | 20 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Otto Balsiger | Trustee | 20 December 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £72.00k | £221.00k | £55.00k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £103.00k | £179.00k | £227.00k | £179.96k | £1.05k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 10 October 2024 | 163 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 27 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 21 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 09 January 2023 | 70 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 11 November 2021 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 11 November 2021 | 11 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 21 OCT 2014 as amended on 01 Nov 2022 as amended on 20 Dec 2022
Charitable objects
The Objects of the Charity are, for the public benefit: • The advancement of health in particular among those with primary immunodeficiency disorders (“PID”) and related disorders and in particular but without limitation by: o Developing best-practice approaches to diagnosis and management of PID and related disorders; o Developing clinical guidelines by means of setting consensus standards based upon agreed UK best practice; o Establishing and maintaining a national patients registry; and • The advancement of education in PID and related subjects including disorders of innate and antigen-specific immunity, in particular but without limitation by promoting improved understanding of PID and related disorders among healthcare professionals, students and the public. • The support and advancement of clinical immunology through education, research, and clinical practice for the benefit of healthcare professionals, the public and patients. This provision may be amended by special resolution but only with the prior written consent of the Commission.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
9 Appold Street
London
EC2A 2AP
- Phone:
- 02030195901
- Email:
- info@ukpin.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window