CLEVEDON CHRISTADELPHIANS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Communion each Sunday - usually incorporates a Bible Talk. Sunday School most Sundays during School terms Target age 4 yrs and older. Youth Group - fortnightly on Fridays during school terms. Coffee Morning -Tuesday mornings Bible Class -Thursday evenings - Approx 1 hour in duration on Zoom. See www.readthebible.org.uk or noticeboard
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
28 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Bath And North East Somerset
- Bristol City
- North Somerset
- Somerset
- South Gloucestershire
- South Africa
Governance
- 19 November 2015: Standard registration
- CLEVEDON CHRISTADELPHIAN ECCLESIA (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROBIN WILLIAM GILLINGHAM | Trustee | 17 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
SARAH ELLEN LAKE | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Teresa Mary James | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Paul Corby | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW LESLIE JAMES | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
DAVID ROBERT EDMONDS | Trustee | 01 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
ROY DEAN | Trustee | 01 January 2005 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.70k | £20.36k | £19.65k | £25.00k | £32.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.53k | £24.06k | £14.93k | £21.52k | £36.61k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 31 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 31 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 28 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 01 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 27 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 27 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 16 APR 2015 AS AMENDED ON 20 OCT 2022 as amended on 04 Dec 2022
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS (THE OBJECTS) ARE: TO ADVANCE BIBLE-BASED CHRISTIAN FAITH TO THE GLORY OF GOD AND THE HONOUR OF JESUS CHRIST IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE CHRISTADELPHIAN BIRMINGHAM AMENDED STATEMENT OF FAITH,(APPENDIX 2),FOR THE BENEFIT OF MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC AND THE WORLDWIDE CHRISTADELPHIAN COMMUNITY PARTICULARLY IN AND AROUND NORTH SOMERSET BY MEANS OF: 1 HOLDING MEETINGS, OPEN TO THE PUBLIC, FOR WORSHIP, PRAYER, BREAKING OF BREAD BY CHRISTADELPHIANS AND BIBLE TEACHING; 2 PREACHING TO THE PUBLIC THROUGH PERSONAL ENGAGEMENT AND/OR BY INVITATIONS TO PREACHING/TEACHING MEETINGS AND/OR BY OTHER MEANS; 3 ENGAGING WITH THE LOCAL PUBLIC THROUGH THE PROVISION OF SUNDAY SCHOOL,YOUTH CLUB(S), COFFEE MORNINGS AND/OR OTHER OCCASIONAL ACTIVITIES; 4 ENGAGING WITH THE WIDER CHRISTADELPHIAN COMMUNITY AND WIDER PUBLIC THROUGH PERIODIC COLLECTIONS FOR CHARITABLE NEEDS, INCLUDING COLLECTIONS FOR RELIEF OF SUFFERING THROUGHOUT THE UK AND WORLDWIDE WHERE APPROPRIATE; AND 5 SERVING,TO THE EXTENT FEASIBLE,THE PASTORAL AND OTHER WELFARE NEEDS OF ECCLESIAL MEMBERS AND OTHERS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
157 MERLIN PARK
PORTISHEAD
BRISTOL
BS20 8RL
- Phone:
- 07711706157
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window