DISCOVER DECRYPT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
advancing heritage for the public benefit by restoration and preservation of the historic Tudor School Room of St Mary de Crypt in Gloucester; advancing education for the public benefit about the history of the Tudor School Room of St Mary de Crypt and of the attached Church of St Mary de Crypt; providing facilities in the interests of social welfare for recreation and leisure time occupation.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 16 May 2016: CIO registration
- THE OLD SCHOOLROOM CHARITY OF ST MARY DE CRYPT (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard John Ryan | Trustee | 04 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ursula Edith Corcoran | Trustee | 20 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
David John Evans | Trustee | 10 May 2019 |
|
|||||
Revd Canon Dr Sandra Millar | Trustee | 15 December 2016 |
|
|||||
PETER CONRAD GOULD | Trustee | 16 May 2016 |
|
|||||
Rev Nicola Mary Arthy | Trustee | 16 May 2016 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £147.47k | £150.30k | £91.22k | £117.69k | £129.62k | |
|
Total expenditure | £562.94k | £155.02k | £103.79k | £124.37k | £139.81k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £73.42k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 29 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 11 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 11 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 25 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 25 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 15 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 15 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 15 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 15 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 16 May 2016
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE:- 3(1) TO ADVANCE HERITAGE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY THE RESTORATION AND PRESERVATION OF THE HISTORIC TUDOR SCHOOL ROOM OF ST MARY DE CRYPT IN GLOUCESTER 3(2) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT ABOUT THE HISTORY OF THE TUDOR SCHOOL ROOM OF ST MARY DE CRYPT AND OF THE ATTACHED CHURCH OF ST MARY DE CRYPT IN GLOUCESTER INCLUDING BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION BY PROMOTING AND PROVIDING LECTURES AND TALKS; STAGING EXHIBITIONS; AND PREPARING AND DISTRIBUTING EDUCATIONAL PUBLICATIONS; 3(3) TO BENEFIT RESIDENTS OF GLOUCESTERSHIRE, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF AGE, SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY PROVIDING FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS. IN FURTHERANCE OF THE OBJECTS BUT NOT OTHERWISE, THE CHARITY TRUSTEES SHALL HAVE POWER TO MAINTAIN OR MANAGE A COMMUNITY CENTRE AT THE OLD SCHOOL ROOM OF ST MARY DE CRYPT GLOUCESTER FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE CHARITY IN FURTHERANCE OF THE OBJECTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
St Mary de Crypt Church and School
Southgate Street
Gloucester
GL1 1TP
- Phone:
- 01452305235
- Email:
- mail@discoverdecrypt.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window