Financial history UNION OF UEA STUDENTS LIMITED

Charity Number: 1162866
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £9.26m £6.18m £8.16m £7.10m £6.96k
Total expenditure £10.36m £6.51m £7.91m £7.52m £7.16k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £1.34m £34.00k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.38m £1.92m £1.92m £1.91m N/A
Income - Other trading activities £6.50m £2.26m £5.45m £4.39m N/A
Income - Charitable activities £647.00k £217.00k £717.00k £737.00k N/A
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Other £733.00k £1.79m £73.00k £71.00k N/A
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.67m £1.37m £1.44m £1.65m N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £4.76m N/A
Expenditure - Governance £12.00k £10.00k £24.00k £32.00k N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other £8.69m £5.14m £6.47m £1.10m N/A