THE LVE CHARITABLE FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We work with young people between the ages of 11-28 to assist them in reaching there full potential but also work across the whole community to offer support Community support is essential for the development and well-being of urban areas. Urban areas can be highly diverse, with people from different backgrounds and cultures living in close proximity. The support and engagement of community
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Enfield
- Haringey
- Newham
- Waltham Forest
Governance
- 18 November 2015: Standard registration
- LVE FOUNDATION (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MICHAEL POLLEDRI MBE | Chair | 16 December 2015 |
|
|||||
Peter French | Trustee | 10 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
GARY WALKER | Trustee | 16 December 2015 |
|
|
||||
JON MICHAEL POLLEDRI | Trustee | 16 December 2015 |
|
|||||
KAREN BELLAMY | Trustee | 16 December 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £201.21k | £157.94k | £372.18k | £372.14k | £420.79k | |
|
Total expenditure | £197.95k | £175.56k | £317.14k | £317.14k | £424.55k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £77.46k | £196.20k | £40.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 01 May 2025 | 182 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 01 May 2025 | 182 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 21 October 2024 | 356 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 21 October 2024 | 356 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 July 2023 | 266 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 26 July 2023 | 268 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 10/11/2015
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS AS WORDED ARE NOT IN AN EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE FORMAT AND WILL NEED TO BE AMENDED. IN YOUR LITERATURE YOU HAVE SAID THAT THE ORGANISATION’S PURPOSE IS TO ADVANCE YOUNG PEOPLE IN LIFE. I WOULD THEREFORE SUGGEST THE TRUSTEES ADOPT OUR MODEL OBJECTS FOR THIS PURPOSE AS FOLLOWS:- TO ACT AS A RESOURCE FOR YOUNG PEOPLE AGED FROM 16 TO 28 LIVING IN NORTH LONDON AND THE LEE VALLEY CORRIDOR BY PROVIDING ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE AND ORGANISING PROGRAMMES OF PHYSICAL, EDUCATIONAL AND OTHER ACTIVITIES AS A MEANS OF: (A) ADVANCING IN LIFE AND HELPING YOUNG PEOPLE BY DEVELOPING THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS INDEPENDENT, MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS; (B) ADVANCING EDUCATION; (C) RELIEVING UNEMPLOYMENT; (D) PROVIDING RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITY IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR PEOPLE LIVING IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT WHO HAVE NEED BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES WITH A VIEW TO IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF SUCH PERSONS.
Area of benefit
LIVING IN NORTH LONDON AND THE LEE VALLEY CORRIDOR
Contact information
- Address:
-
LVE Charitable Foundation
Legacy Business Centre
2A Ruckholt Road
Leyton
London
E10 5NP
- Phone:
- 020 8558 1445
- Email:
- Karen@lvefoundation.org.uk
- Website:
-
lvefoundation.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window