THE WORSHIPFUL COMPANY OF CARMEN BENEVOLENT TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Raises money (largely through the Worshipful Company of Carmen), using it to relieve necessitous persons in these classes (including their dependants and former members): Liverymen/Freemen of the Company, Company employees, those engaged in UK transport/logistics and armed forces personnel in transport/logistics. Educating the public about carmen and transport workers and other charitable purposes
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 03 December 2015: CIO registration
- 27 July 2016: Funds received from 1050893 THE WORSHIPFUL COMPANY OF CARMEN BENEVOLENT TRUST
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sharon Kindleysides | Trustee | 18 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paul Sainthouse | Trustee | 15 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Pugsley | Trustee | 18 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
JOHN CHRISTOPHER GODBOLD FRSA FCILT | Trustee | 04 April 2023 |
|
|||||
Stephen Richard Rinsler | Trustee | 15 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Iain Golder | Trustee | 29 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Turner | Trustee | 16 February 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £92.15k | £76.43k | £55.06k | £52.97k | £47.05k | |
|
Total expenditure | £111.18k | £80.70k | £115.17k | £85.41k | £73.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 02 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 02 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 24 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 24 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 09 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 09 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 08 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 08 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 21 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 21 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION REGISTERED ON 03 DEC 2015 AS AMENDED ON 11 DEC 2018 as amended on 26 Jan 2024
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE (1) THE RELIEF OF NECESSITOUS PERSONS WHO ARE OR WHO HAVE BEEN LIVERYMEN OR FREEMEN OF THE WORSHIPFUL COMPANY OF CARMEN (THE "COMPANY") OR THE NECESSITOUS WIDOWS, WIDOWERS, CIVIL PARTNERS, CHILDREN OR DEPENDANTS (TOGETHER "DEPENDANTS") OF LIVERYMEN OR FREEMEN OF THE COMPANY. (2) THE RELIEF OF NECESSITOUS PERSONS WHO ARE OR WHO HAVE BEEN IN THE EMPLOYMENT OR SERVICE OF THE COMPANY OR THEIR DEPENDANTS. (3) THE RELIEF OF NECESSITOUS PERSONS WHO ARE OR HAVE BEEN ENGAGED IN OR CONNECTED WITH ANY SECTORS OF THE TRANSPORT INDUSTRY OR TRANSPORT LOGISTICS IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND THEIR DEPENDANTS. (4) THE RELIEF OF NECESSITOUS PERSONS WHO ARE OR HAVE BEEN UNITED KINGDOM ARMED FORCES PERSONNEL ENGAGED IN TRANSPORT OR TRANSPORT LOGISTICS AND THEIR DEPENDANTS. (5) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF THE PUBLIC CONCERNING THE OCCUPATION OF CARMEN AND OF THOSE WORKING WITHIN THE TRANSPORT OR TRANSPORT LOGISTICS INDUSTRY GENERALLY. (6) SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN THE CITY OF LONDON OR ELSEWHERE IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES SHALL DETERMINE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Carmen's Hall
186C Fleet Street
LONDON
EC4A 2HR
- Phone:
- 07774210933
- Email:
- carmenbentrust@hotmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window