Financial history The Parochial Church Council of the Parish of St Etheldreda with St Clement, Fulham

Charity Number: 1163860
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £123.70k £183.42k £217.55k £262.99k £352.42k
Total expenditure £153.23k £174.31k £188.47k £366.20k £357.94k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A