INSTITUTE OF BRITISH SIGN LANGUAGE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
IBSL provide a range of qualifications in British Sign Language (BSL) and Deaf Studies that meet the needs of learners of all ages and abilities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2021
Total income includes £26,676 from 2 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 21 September 2015: Standard registration
- IBSL (Working name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KHALID ASHRAF | Chair | 06 June 2022 |
|
|||||
Agnes Dyab | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Joselyn Taylor | Trustee | 10 February 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2017 | 31/07/2018 | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £164.08k | £281.88k | £253.77k | £143.83k | £150.18k | |
|
Total expenditure | £156.14k | £211.68k | £232.26k | £237.09k | £202.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | £5.36k | £26.68k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 336 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 336 days | |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 702 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 702 days | |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 23 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 23 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 21 July 2021 | 51 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 21 July 2021 | 51 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 30 July 2020 | 60 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 30 July 2020 | 60 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 29 APR 2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 09 APR 2015
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN BRITISH SIGN LANGUAGE, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF ACCREDITED TRAINING SCHEME.
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 Strawberry Fields
CHORLEY
Lancashire
PR7 1PQ
- Phone:
- 01257 221326
- Email:
- michellejones@ibsl.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window