Financial history ROYAL NAVY RUGBY UNION

Charity Number: 1165153
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £353.61k £197.67k £1.36m £1.39m £499.07k
Total expenditure £613.02k £219.47k £1.11m £1.10m £358.50k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £1.25k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £99.46k £124.56k N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £1.14m £1.24m N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £120.12k £20.39k N/A
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A
Income - Investment N/A N/A £0 £1.21k N/A
Income - Other N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £393.37k £355.88k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £718.36k £745.10k N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £4.24k £6.01k N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A