Financial history LOVE'S FARM COMMUNITY CHURCH

Charity Number: 1165671
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £15.96k £18.80k £40.67k £22.66k £22.93k
Total expenditure £13.22k £19.51k £33.17k £21.59k £11.22k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £180 N/A N/A