GILLINGHAM SALEM CHURCH OF THE NAZARENE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Sunday services for Christian worship, communion, prayer, Bible teaching including weddings, funerals etc.. Mid week Christian Bible study groups and missionary meeting To help serve the local community in Medway providing clubs for people to meet local need including renting rooms. Partner with Medway Foodbank, giving out food vouchers to people
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2018
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Medway
Governance
- 29 January 2016: CIO registration
- 06 November 2023: Removed (Removed by application)
- 06 November 2023: Funds transferred to 214779 THE SALVATION ARMY
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2016 | 30/09/2017 | 30/09/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.93k | £20.00k | £25.27k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.60k | £24.55k | £23.65k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 29 Jan 2016
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH AS PART OF THE CHURCH OF THE NAZARENE INC AND THE DISTRICT PRINCIPALLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN NORTHERN ENGLAND.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window