THE OTHER WAY WORKS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Other Way Works creates playful theatre that immerses our audiences in the story. The intimate scenarios we create allow our audiences to explore places and perspectives anew, provoking them to change the way they live their lives. We work in the performing arts sector at the forefront of theatrical innovation with our own distinctive approach to creating and presenting theatre.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
Governance
- 22 April 2016: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Daniel Brown | Chair | 03 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Ben James Wooldridge | Trustee | 24 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Joanna Jayne Bucknall | Trustee | 16 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stuart Rogers | Trustee | 08 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Robert James Lindsay | Trustee | 04 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
Clayton Shaw | Trustee | 04 April 2016 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £60.16k | £39.98k | £61.44k | £53.97k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £73.85k | £37.09k | £61.61k | £24.54k | £18.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £46.74k | £24.71k | £51.57k | £26.28k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 05 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 02 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 02 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 16 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 16 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 08 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 08 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 15/05/2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 03/06/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 29/01/2016 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 18 APR 2016
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE ARTS AND CULTURE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY: 1) PROMOTING THE ARTS, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THE ART OF DRAMA, AT A LOCAL, NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL PROFESSIONAL LEVEL; 2) PROVIDING MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC WITH INSPIRING, PLAYFUL, AND CHALLENGING ARTS EXPERIENCES OF AN OBJECTIVELY HIGH STANDARD THAT ALLOW THEM TO EXPLORE PLACES AND PERSPECTIVES ANEW; 3) PRODUCING ARTS PROJECTS, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY DRAMA PRODUCTIONS, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT; AND 4) SUPPORTING AND ADVANCING THE THEATRE AND PERFORMING ARTS SECTOR FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PROVIDING AND ENGAGING WITH TARGETED ARTS PROFESSIONAL DEVELOPMENT PROGRAMMES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
32 Melton Road
BIRMINGHAM
B14 7DA
- Phone:
- 07968140089
- Email:
- info@theotherwayworks.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window