Accounts and annual returns LLANW

Charity number: 1166349
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2024 02 May 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2024 02 May 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2023 22 June 2024 22 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 01 August 2024 62 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2022 22 June 2023 22 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 22 June 2023 22 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2021 25 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 25 April 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2020 25 April 2022 329 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 25 April 2022 329 days late Download Open in new window