THE DURHAM AND NEWCASTLE DIOCESAN ASSOCIATION OF CHURCH BELL RINGERS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
AIMS TO BE OF SERVICE TO THE CHURCH IN THE DIOCESES OF DURHAM & NEWCASTLE BY: PROMOTING THE RINGING OF BELLS FOR CHRISTIAN WORSHIP AND ON OTHER APPROPRIATE OCCASIONS; RECRUITING AND TRAINING RINGERS; ENCOURAGING THE ART OF CHANGE-RINGING; HELPING RINGERS TO IMPROVE THE STANDARD OF THEIR RINGING; AND ASSISTING WITH THE CARE OF RESTORATION OF BELLS AND THEIR FITTINGS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

18 Trustee(s)
452 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Darlington
- Durham
- Hartlepool
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
- North Tyneside
- Northumberland
- South Tyneside
- Stockton-on-tees
Governance
- 28 April 1978: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
18 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew Cairns | Chair | 23 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stephen John Bean | Trustee | 26 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Janet Lesley Jackson | Trustee | 24 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michael Howard Anderson | Trustee | 20 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Brooke Bell | Trustee | 04 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Prof Christopher James Crabtree | Trustee | 18 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sonia Alice Thompson | Trustee | 23 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Angela Ruth Cairns | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Helen Louise Scott | Trustee | 14 April 2018 |
|
|||||
James Crowther | Trustee | 01 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER HUGH ENZOR | Trustee | 16 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Alexander Thomas Garswood Pym | Trustee | 16 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
Anthea Elizabeth Langford Enzor | Trustee | 29 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
Jack Hanlon | Trustee | 24 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
Robert Victor Criddle | Trustee | 17 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
Dr Michael Charles Prentice | Trustee | 28 April 2012 |
|
|
||||
KRISTOPHER KING | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
HOWARD SMITH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £55.33k | £5.42k | £61.56k | £6.54k | £10.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £70.74k | £1.06k | £68.44k | £12.32k | £4.46k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 17 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 04 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 04 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 21 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED 15/04/1978 AS AMENDED ON 25/04/2009 AS AMENDED ON 24/04/2010 as amended on 25 Apr 2015 as amended on 23 Apr 2022
Charitable objects
THE ASSOCIATION SHALL BE OF SERVICE TO CHURCHES IN THE GEOGRAPHICAL BOUNDARIES WITHIN THE DIOCESES OF DURHAM & NEWCASTLE BY A) PROMOTING THE RINGING OF BELLS FOR CHRISTIAN WORSHIP AND ON OTHER APPROPRIATE OCCASIONS B) RECRUITING AND TRAINING RINGERS C) ENCOURAGING THE ART OF CHANGE-RINGING D) HELPING RINGERS TO IMPROVE THE STANDARD OF THEIR RINGING E) THE CARE AND RESTORATION OF BELLS AND THEIR FITTINGS.
Area of benefit
THE DIOCESES OF DURHAM AND NEWCASTLE
Contact information
- Address:
-
8 Station Road
SEAHAM
County Durham
SR7 0AA
- Phone:
- 07904 983168
- Email:
- generalsecretary@dandn.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window