Financial history Paediatric Critical Care Society

Charity Number: 1165535
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £70.89k £76.74k £113.56k £225.80k £310.57k
Total expenditure £97.22k £70.64k £111.33k £247.38k £282.14k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A