Financial history ONESACRE SCHOOL FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 507549
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £525 £581 £540 £741 £346
Total expenditure £2.24k £1.18k £3.84k £1.68k £682
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A